Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Coastal Bays

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104 (SB0149/CH0434)
Title
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 (SB0958)
Title
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 /CH0628 (SB1006/CH0629)
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1381
Title
Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0089 /CH0060
Title
Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Zone Advisory Commission and Captive Wildlife Advisory Committee - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149 /CH0434 (HB0104)
Title
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183
Title
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Recreational License Donation Fund - Donations
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0777
Title
Aquaculture Leases - Notice - Homeowners Associations
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958 (HB0947)
Title
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006 /CH0629 (HB1350/CH0628)
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 (SB0149/CH0434) Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations Delegate Robinson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0947 (SB0958) Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 /CH0628 (SB1006/CH0629) Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1381 Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0089 /CH0060 Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Zone Advisory Commission and Captive Wildlife Advisory Committee - Repeal Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0149 /CH0434 (HB0104) Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary Donations Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0183 Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Recreational License Donation Fund - Donations Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0777 Aquaculture Leases - Notice - Homeowners Associations Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0958 (HB0947) Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of Funds Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1006 /CH0629 (HB1350/CH0628) Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM