Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Codes -see also- Annotated Code of Md; Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203 (SB0852)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Accessibility Code - Applicability
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207 /CH0050 (SB0140/CH0049)
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405 (SB0461)
Title
Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0412 (SB0789)
Title
Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0140 /CH0049 (HB0207/CH0050)
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 (HB0405)
Title
Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789 (HB0412)
Title
Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852 (HB0203)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Accessibility Code - Applicability
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0203 (SB0852) Public Safety - Maryland Accessibility Code - Applicability Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0207 /CH0050 (SB0140/CH0049) St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0405 (SB0461) Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0412 (SB0789) Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6 Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0140 /CH0049 (HB0207/CH0050) St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0461 (HB0405) Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications Senator Conway 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0789 (HB0412) Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6 Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0852 (HB0203) Public Safety - Maryland Accessibility Code - Applicability Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM