Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Codes -see also- Annotated Code of Md; Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200 /CH0106 (SB0859/CH0107)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plate Frames and Borders - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 (SB0284)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0482 /CH0218 (SB0428/CH0219)
Title
Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511 (SB0247)
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0748 /CH0310
Title
Transportation - Kim Lamphier Bikeways Network Program
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791
Title
Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Procurement MC 5-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 (SB0675)
Title
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 (SB0994/CH0591)
Title
Maryland Electricians Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247 (HB0511)
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 (HB0346)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0340
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB0990)
Title
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0859 /CH0107 (HB0200/CH0106)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plate Frames and Borders - Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994 /CH0591 (HB1127)
Title
Department of Labor – Electricians – State Licensing Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1075
Title
Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0200 /CH0106 (SB0859/CH0107) Vehicle Laws - Registration Plate Frames and Borders - Enforcement Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 106
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0346 (SB0284) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0482 /CH0218 (SB0428/CH0219) Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 218
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0511 (SB0247) Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0748 /CH0310 Transportation - Kim Lamphier Bikeways Network Program Delegate Barve 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 310
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB0791 Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Procurement MC 5-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0990 (SB0675) Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1127 (SB0994/CH0591) Maryland Electricians Act of 2020 Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0247 (HB0511) Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0284 (HB0346) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0340 Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0675 (HB0990) Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0859 /CH0107 (HB0200/CH0106) Vehicle Laws - Registration Plate Frames and Borders - Enforcement Senator Sydnor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 107
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0994 /CH0591 (HB1127) Department of Labor – Electricians – State Licensing Workgroup Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 591
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1075 Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:30 PM