Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Collective Bargaining

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 (SB0293/CH0288)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0435
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 (SB0749)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917
Title
Maryland Aviation Administration - Contract Authority - Transportation Companies
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1066
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority Police - Collective Bargaining - Binding Arbitration
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181 /CH0370 (SB1066/CH0369)
Title
Fairness in Negotiations Act and the Public School Labor Relations Board - Sunset Repeal and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224 (SB0989)
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration
Sponsor
Delegate DeBoy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292 (SB0824)
Title
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1304
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Interrogation Right to Counsel - Suspension Period and Appointment
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1545 /CH0376 (SB1104/CH0375)
Title
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation - Governance - Medical Center Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293 /CH0288 (HB0257)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749 (HB0490)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 (HB1292)
Title
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0989 (HB1224)
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1066 /CH0369 (HB1181/CH0370)
Title
Fairness in Negotiations Act and the Public School Labor Relations Board - Sunset Repeal and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1104 /CH0375 (HB1545/CH0376)
Title
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation - Governance - Medical Center Employees
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0257 (SB0293/CH0288) Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0435 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0490 (SB0749) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0917 Maryland Aviation Administration - Contract Authority - Transportation Companies Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1066 Maryland Transportation Authority Police - Collective Bargaining - Binding Arbitration Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1181 /CH0370 (SB1066/CH0369) Fairness in Negotiations Act and the Public School Labor Relations Board - Sunset Repeal and Reporting Requirements Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1224 (SB0989) State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration Delegate DeBoy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1292 (SB0824) District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining Delegate Jones 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1304 Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Interrogation Right to Counsel - Suspension Period and Appointment Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1545 /CH0376 (SB1104/CH0375) University of Maryland Medical System Corporation - Governance - Medical Center Employees Delegate Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Appropriations
3/13/2014 - 9:00 AM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0204 Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2014 Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0293 /CH0288 (HB0257) Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0749 (HB0490) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0824 (HB1292) District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0989 (HB1224) State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1066 /CH0369 (HB1181/CH0370) Fairness in Negotiations Act and the Public School Labor Relations Board - Sunset Repeal and Reporting Requirements Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1104 /CH0375 (HB1545/CH0376) University of Maryland Medical System Corporation - Governance - Medical Center Employees Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM