Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Collective Bargaining

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017
Title
Elementary and Secondary Education - Required Number of School Days - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0232 /CH0829
Title
Correctional Services - Commissioner's Duties - Staffing Report
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239 (SB0291/CH0015)
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446 /CH0178 (SB0909/CH0177)
Title
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507
Title
Community Colleges and Local Governments - Unfair Labor Practices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0531
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670
Title
Harford County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852 /CH0483
Title
Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations Period
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871 (SB0652)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023 (SB0545)
Title
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250
Title
Higher Education - Student Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1431
Title
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1617
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011
Title
Correctional Services - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Composition of Hearing Board
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 /CH0015 (HB0239)
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Act
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0515 /CH0182
Title
Collective Bargaining - Firefighters - Martin State Airport
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0545 (HB1023)
Title
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 (HB0871)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909 /CH0177 (HB0446/CH0178)
Title
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1027 /CH0482
Title
Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations Period
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 Elementary and Secondary Education - Required Number of School Days - Repeal Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0232 /CH0829 Correctional Services - Commissioner's Duties - Staffing Report Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 829
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0239 (SB0291/CH0015) Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0446 /CH0178 (SB0909/CH0177) Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0507 Community Colleges and Local Governments - Unfair Labor Practices - Prohibition Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0531 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0670 Harford County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0852 /CH0483 Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations Period Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0871 (SB0652) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1023 (SB0545) Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1250 Higher Education - Student Employees - Collective Bargaining Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
HB1370 Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1431 Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-0)
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1617 State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher Education Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0011 Correctional Services - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Composition of Hearing Board Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0291 /CH0015 (HB0239) Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0490 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Act Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0515 /CH0182 Collective Bargaining - Firefighters - Martin State Airport Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0545 (HB1023) Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board Senator Conway 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0652 (HB0871) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0909 /CH0177 (HB0446/CH0178) Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials Charles County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1027 /CH0482 Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations Period Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM