Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commerce, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0046 (SB0089)
Title
Small Business Relief Tax Credit - Expansion
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0117 (SB0003)
Title
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150 (SB0174)
Title
More Opportunities for Marylanders Act of 2019
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0480 (SB0508)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0886
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 (SB0574/CH0306)
Title
Department of Commerce – Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer – Study
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235 (SB0702)
Title
Healthy Climate Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404 /CH0743
Title
Economic Development – Baltimore Symphony Orchestra – Funding and Workgroup (The John C. Merrill Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 (HB0117)
Title
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund – Supplementary Appropriation
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0089 (HB0046)
Title
Small Business Relief Tax Credit – Alterations
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0005 (HB0042)
Title
State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174 (HB0150)
Title
More Opportunities for Marylanders Act of 2019
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0244
Title
Income Tax Credit - Individuals Working in STEM Fields - Student Loan Payments
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360
Title
Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0507
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508 (HB0480)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 /CH0757 (HB1158)
Title
Clean Energy Jobs
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574 /CH0306 (HB1161)
Title
Department of Commerce – Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer – Study
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260)
Title
Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628 (HB1387)
Title
Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663
Title
Commerce, Housing, and Community Development - Opportunity Zones
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB1235)
Title
Healthy Climate Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0740
Title
Counties – Innovative Development Competitions
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0046 (SB0089) Small Business Relief Tax Credit - Expansion Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0117 (SB0003) Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0150 (SB0174) More Opportunities for Marylanders Act of 2019 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0480 (SB0508) Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0886 Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1161 (SB0574/CH0306) Department of Commerce – Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer – Study Delegate Qi 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1235 (SB0702) Healthy Climate Initiative Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1404 /CH0743 Economic Development – Baltimore Symphony Orchestra – Funding and Workgroup (The John C. Merrill Act) Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 743
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0003 (HB0117) Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund – Supplementary Appropriation Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0089 (HB0046) Small Business Relief Tax Credit – Alterations President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0094 /CH0005 (HB0042) State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 5
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0174 (HB0150) More Opportunities for Marylanders Act of 2019 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0244 Income Tax Credit - Individuals Working in STEM Fields - Student Loan Payments Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0360 Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0507 Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0508 (HB0480) Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0516 /CH0757 (HB1158) Clean Energy Jobs Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 757
Finance
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0574 /CH0306 (HB1161) Department of Commerce – Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer – Study Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Finance
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260) Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0628 (HB1387) Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0663 Commerce, Housing, and Community Development - Opportunity Zones Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0702 (HB1235) Healthy Climate Initiative Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0740 Counties – Innovative Development Competitions Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:20 PM