Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Rehabilitation -see also- Urban Renewal

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203
Title
Economic Development - Arts, Business, and Cultural District - Pennsylvania Avenue Corridor in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0234 /CH0360
Title
Transportation - Baltimore Corridor Red Line Transit Study
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0624
Title
Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1315 /CH0150
Title
Economic Development Programs - Data Collection and Tracking (Maryland Jobs Development Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0203 Economic Development - Arts, Business, and Cultural District - Pennsylvania Avenue Corridor in Baltimore City Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0234 /CH0360 Transportation - Baltimore Corridor Red Line Transit Study Delegate Oaks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0613 /CH0624 Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB1315 /CH0150 Economic Development Programs - Data Collection and Tracking (Maryland Jobs Development Act) Delegate Clagett 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Economic Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM