Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Rehabilitation -see also- Urban Renewal

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0473 (SB0787)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510 /CH0601
Title
Sustainable Communities Tax Credit Program - Extension and Alteration
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0691 (SB0605/CH0538)
Title
Property Tax Credit - Upper Stories of Commercial Structures - Rehabilitation
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605 /CH0538 (HB0691)
Title
Property Tax Credit - Commercial Structures - Rehabilitation
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB0473)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0473 (SB0787) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Delegate Summers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0510 /CH0601 Sustainable Communities Tax Credit Program - Extension and Alteration Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0691 (SB0605/CH0538) Property Tax Credit - Upper Stories of Commercial Structures - Rehabilitation Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0605 /CH0538 (HB0691) Property Tax Credit - Commercial Structures - Rehabilitation Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0787 (HB0473) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM