Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Rehabilitation -see also- Urban Renewal

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307 (SB0248)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - 908-912 Washington Boulevard Project
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 (SB0247)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Pigtown Facade Restoration
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0820
Title
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credit - Distressed Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247 (HB0740)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Pigtown Facade Restoration
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248 (HB0307)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - 908-912 Washington Boulevard Project
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339 /CH0026
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore City - Belvedere Square
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0307 (SB0248) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - 908-912 Washington Boulevard Project Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 12:00 PM
HB0740 (SB0247) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Pigtown Facade Restoration Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 12:00 PM
HB0820 One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credit - Distressed Municipal Corporations Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0247 (HB0740) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Pigtown Facade Restoration Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 9:00 AM
SB0248 (HB0307) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - 908-912 Washington Boulevard Project Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0339 /CH0026 Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore City - Belvedere Square Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM