Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Rehabilitation -see also- Urban Renewal

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0584
Title
Economic Development - One Maryland Tax Credit - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1507 (SB0974)
Title
Arts and Entertainment Districts - Artistic Work - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1553 (SB1066)
Title
Economic Development - BRAC Revitalization and Incentive Zones - Extraordinary Development District
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 (HB0642/CH0110)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0759 /CH0578 (HB0939)
Title
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Alteration and Extension
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0974 (HB1507)
Title
Arts and Entertainment Districts - Artistic Work - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1062 /CH0603 (HB1533/CH0604)
Title
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment Areas
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1066 (HB1553)
Title
Economic Development - BRAC Revitalization and Incentive Zones - Extraordinary Development District
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0584 Economic Development - One Maryland Tax Credit - Expansion Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1507 (SB0974) Arts and Entertainment Districts - Artistic Work - Eligibility Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1553 (SB1066) Economic Development - BRAC Revitalization and Incentive Zones - Extraordinary Development District Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
SB0033 (HB0642/CH0110) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Senator Astle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0737 Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB0738 Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB0759 /CH0578 (HB0939) Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Alteration and Extension Senator Madaleno 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 578
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0974 (HB1507) Arts and Entertainment Districts - Artistic Work - Eligibility Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1062 /CH0603 (HB1533/CH0604) Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment Areas Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1066 (HB1553) Economic Development - BRAC Revitalization and Incentive Zones - Extraordinary Development District Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM