Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Rehabilitation -see also- Urban Renewal

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0051 (SB0106)
Title
Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1162 (SB0656)
Title
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Alterations - Opportunity Zones, Targeted Projects, and Transferability
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1315 /CH0455 (SB0432/CH0454)
Title
Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106 (HB0051)
Title
Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 /CH0454 (HB1315/CH0455)
Title
Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260)
Title
Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB1162)
Title
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Alterations - Opportunity Zones, Targeted Projects, and Transferability
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0051 (SB0106) Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1162 (SB0656) Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Alterations - Opportunity Zones, Targeted Projects, and Transferability Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1315 /CH0455 (SB0432/CH0454) Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Appropriations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0106 (HB0051) Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0432 /CH0454 (HB1315/CH0455) Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260) Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 (HB1162) Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Alterations - Opportunity Zones, Targeted Projects, and Transferability Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2019 - 1:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:20 PM