Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commercial Rehabilitation -see also- Urban Renewal

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862 /CH0633 (SB0978)
Title
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Transferability (Historic Revitalization Tax Credit Improvement Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193 (SB0358)
Title
Sales and Use Tax Refund - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0358 (HB1193)
Title
Sales and Use Tax Refund - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978 (HB0862/CH0633)
Title
Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Transferability, Funding, and Extension (Historic Revitalization Tax Credit Improvement Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0862 /CH0633 (SB0978) Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Transferability (Historic Revitalization Tax Credit Improvement Act of 2020) Delegate Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 633
Ways and Means
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1193 (SB0358) Sales and Use Tax Refund - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0358 (HB1193) Sales and Use Tax Refund - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0978 (HB0862/CH0633) Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Transferability, Funding, and Extension (Historic Revitalization Tax Credit Improvement Act of 2020) Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2020 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 1:47 PM