Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Community Colleges

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018 /CH0270 (SB0074/CH0269)
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0019
Title
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Surveys and Sexual Assault Victim Advocates
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0484
Title
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Tuition Reduction for Unemployed Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 (SB0749)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0531
Title
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Bachelor's Degree Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0552 (SB0246/CH0148)
Title
Public Safety - Anne Arundel Community College Police Force
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855 (SB0038)
Title
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065
Title
Higher Education - Transfer Agreement - Number of Credits Allowed
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215 /CH0340 (SB0785/CH0339)
Title
Higher Education - 2+2 Transfer Scholarship
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224 (SB0989)
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration
Sponsor
Delegate DeBoy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1504
Title
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038 (HB0855)
Title
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074 /CH0269 (HB0018/CH0270)
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial Information
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0134
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Innovative Partnerships for Technology Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0246 /CH0148 (HB0552)
Title
Public Safety - Anne Arundel Community College Police Force
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463
Title
Community Colleges - Developmental Education Courses - Student Credit Hours
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749 (HB0490)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0785 /CH0339 (HB1215/CH0340)
Title
Higher Education - 2+2 Transfer Scholarship
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0989 (HB1224)
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 /CH0270 (SB0074/CH0269) Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial Information Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Appropriations
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0019 Higher Education - Sexual Assault Surveys and Sexual Assault Victim Advocates Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0484 Higher Education - Community Colleges - Tuition Reduction for Unemployed Individuals Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0490 (SB0749) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0531 Higher Education - Community Colleges - Bachelor's Degree Programs Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0552 (SB0246/CH0148) Public Safety - Anne Arundel Community College Police Force Delegate Schuh 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0855 (SB0038) Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members Caroline County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0862 Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1065 Higher Education - Transfer Agreement - Number of Credits Allowed Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
Appropriations
HB1215 /CH0340 (SB0785/CH0339) Higher Education - 2+2 Transfer Scholarship Delegate Bohanan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1224 (SB0989) State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration Delegate DeBoy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1504 Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2014 Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0031 Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement Senator Colburn 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0038 (HB0855) Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members Senator Colburn 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0074 /CH0269 (HB0018/CH0270) Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial Information Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0134 Maryland Higher Education Commission - Innovative Partnerships for Technology Program - Repeal Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0246 /CH0148 (HB0552) Public Safety - Anne Arundel Community College Police Force Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0463 Community Colleges - Developmental Education Courses - Student Credit Hours Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0749 (HB0490) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0785 /CH0339 (HB1215/CH0340) Higher Education - 2+2 Transfer Scholarship Senator Currie 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0989 (HB1224) State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM