Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Community Development

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 /CH0082
Title
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program - Project Proposals
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335 /CH0574 (SB0900/CH0573)
Title
Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030 /CH0660
Title
Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060 /CH0011
Title
Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans - Financial Assistance for Families of Limited Income
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 /CH0013
Title
Community Legacy Program - Application Requirements - Approval by Authorized Designee
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0900 /CH0573 (HB0335/CH0574)
Title
Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0108 /CH0082 Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program - Project Proposals Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Environmental Matters
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0335 /CH0574 (SB0900/CH0573) Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects Delegate Mitchell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1030 /CH0660 Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - Definition Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660
Ways and Means
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
SB0060 /CH0011 Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans - Financial Assistance for Families of Limited Income Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0062 /CH0013 Community Legacy Program - Application Requirements - Approval by Authorized Designee Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0900 /CH0573 (HB0335/CH0574) Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM