Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Community Development

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0450 (SB0486/CH0511)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451 /CH0228
Title
Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food Deserts
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453 /CH0229
Title
Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency Act
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 /CH0233
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH0531 (SB0600/CH0530)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0820 (SB0499)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Coppin Heights Urban Revitalization Project - Phase I
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 /CH0470 (SB0137/CH0469)
Title
Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062 (SB0714)
Title
Baltimore City - 10-Year Plan for Public School Facilities - Neighborhood Revitalization and Community Development
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1460 (SB0995)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Redevelopment of 4510 41st Avenue and 4516 41st Avenue
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1537
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Upton Planning Committee Project
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0469 (HB1024/CH0470)
Title
Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 /CH0511 (HB0450)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0499 (HB0820)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Coppin Heights Urban Revitalization Project - Phase I
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0530 (HB0742/CH0531)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0714 (HB1062)
Title
Baltimore City - 10-Year Plan for Public School Facilities - Neighborhood Revitalization and Community Development
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0995 (HB1460)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Redevelopment of 4510 41st Avenue and 4516 41st Avenue
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0450 (SB0486/CH0511) Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0451 /CH0228 Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food Deserts Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0453 /CH0229 Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency Act Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0595 /CH0233 Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial Institutions Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0742 /CH0531 (SB0600/CH0530) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0820 (SB0499) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Coppin Heights Urban Revitalization Project - Phase I Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 10:00 AM
HB1024 /CH0470 (SB0137/CH0469) Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1062 (SB0714) Baltimore City - 10-Year Plan for Public School Facilities - Neighborhood Revitalization and Community Development Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1460 (SB0995) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Redevelopment of 4510 41st Avenue and 4516 41st Avenue Delegate Summers 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 11:00 AM
HB1537 Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Upton Planning Committee Project Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 5:00 PM
SB0137 /CH0469 (HB1024/CH0470) Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 /CH0511 (HB0450) Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0499 (HB0820) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Coppin Heights Urban Revitalization Project - Phase I Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 9:00 AM
SB0600 /CH0530 (HB0742/CH0531) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0714 (HB1062) Baltimore City - 10-Year Plan for Public School Facilities - Neighborhood Revitalization and Community Development Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0995 (HB1460) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Redevelopment of 4510 41st Avenue and 4516 41st Avenue Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM