Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Communications -see also- Language; Telecommun & Info Tech

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 /CH0039 (SB0267/CH0038)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1271
Title
Courts - Unauthorized Use of Name or Likeness
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 /CH0038 (HB0116/CH0039)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056
Title
Election Law - Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Disclosure
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0116 /CH0039 (SB0267/CH0038) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud Delegate Mitchell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Judiciary
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1271 Courts - Unauthorized Use of Name or Likeness Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0267 /CH0038 (HB0116/CH0039) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 President 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1056 Election Law - Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Disclosure Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM