Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Communications -see also- Language; Telecommun & Info Tech

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219
Title
Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 (SB0311)
Title
Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541 /CH0431
Title
Public Service Commission - Attachments to Utility Poles - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Between Candidates and Outside Spending Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 (SB0916)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 (HB0226)
Title
Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0916 (HB1246)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0219 Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and Reporting Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0226 (SB0311) Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0541 /CH0431 Public Service Commission - Attachments to Utility Poles - Study Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Economic Matters
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1088 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Between Candidates and Outside Spending Organizations Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1246 (SB0916) Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0311 (HB0226) Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0916 (HB1246) Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM