Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Communications -see also- Electronic Comm; Language; Telecom

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620
Title
State Government - Toll-Free Calling to Units - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0808 (SB0660)
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0824 /CH0823 (SB0548/CH0824)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882 (SB0805)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0898 /CH0852
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082 /CH0573 (SB1060/CH0574)
Title
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165
Title
Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family Relationships
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 /CH0620 (SB0717/CH0621)
Title
Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273 /CH0726 (SB0997)
Title
Pharmacists - Substitution and Dispensing of Biological Products
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1498 /CH0851
Title
Campaign Finance - Political Organizations - Compliance and Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1518
Title
Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0008 /CH0036
Title
Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130 /CH0282
Title
Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Principals
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0660 (HB0808)
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0717 /CH0621 (HB1169/CH0620)
Title
Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB0882)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0997 (HB1273/CH0726)
Title
Pharmacists - Substitution and Dispensing of Biological Products
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1060 /CH0574 (HB1082/CH0573)
Title
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1106 /CH0610 (HB0352)
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0620 State Government - Toll-Free Calling to Units - Repeal Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0808 (SB0660) Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0824 /CH0823 (SB0548/CH0824) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0882 (SB0805) Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0898 /CH0852 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1082 /CH0573 (SB1060/CH0574) Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act) Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1165 Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family Relationships Delegate Saab 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1169 /CH0620 (SB0717/CH0621) Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017 Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Economic Matters
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1273 /CH0726 (SB0997) Pharmacists - Substitution and Dispensing of Biological Products Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 726
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1292 State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
HB1498 /CH0851 Campaign Finance - Political Organizations - Compliance and Disclosure Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 851
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1518 Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0008 /CH0036 Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Finance
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0130 /CH0282 Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Principals Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0660 (HB0808) Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0717 /CH0621 (HB1169/CH0620) Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017 Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Finance
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0805 (HB0882) Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0997 (HB1273/CH0726) Pharmacists - Substitution and Dispensing of Biological Products Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1060 /CH0574 (HB1082/CH0573) Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act) Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1106 /CH0610 (HB0352) Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 610
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM