Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commuters -see also- Car Pools

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Toll Discount Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 /CH0238
Title
Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization Study
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546
Title
Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085 (SB0376)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275
Title
Transportation - Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Discounted Variable Toll Rate for Commuters
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376 (HB1085)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0370
Title
Chesapeake Bay Trust and Chesapeake Conservation Corps - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0214 Maryland Transportation Authority - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Toll Discount Plans Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0300 /CH0238 Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization Study Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0546 Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1085 (SB0376) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0275 Transportation - Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Discounted Variable Toll Rate for Commuters Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0376 (HB1085) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0600 /CH0370 Chesapeake Bay Trust and Chesapeake Conservation Corps - Funding Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM