Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commuters -see also- Car Pools

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939
Title
Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227
Title
Tax Credit - Commuter Benefits - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1317
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1332
Title
Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Commuter Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1468 /CH0793
Title
Transit - Job Access and Reverse Commute (JARC) Program
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 /CH0852 (HB1045)
Title
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0939 Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1227 Tax Credit - Commuter Benefits - Alterations Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1317 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1332 Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Commuter Plan Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
HB1468 /CH0793 Transit - Job Access and Reverse Commute (JARC) Program Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 793
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2018 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0743 /CH0852 (HB1045) Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM