Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commuters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201 (SB0319/CH0420)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0763
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Coordination of Public Transportation Network
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Extension of MARC Service - Plans and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0319 /CH0420 (HB0201)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0201 (SB0319/CH0420) Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees) Delegate Korman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0763 Maryland Transit Administration - Coordination of Public Transportation Network Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1117 Maryland Transit Administration - Extension of MARC Service - Plans and Report Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0319 /CH0420 (HB0201) Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees) Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:20 PM