Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Condemnation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743)
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864
Title
Real Property - Eminent Domain - Limitations on Condemnation Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0883 (SB0398)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jurisdiction over Eminent Domain Cases - Circuit Court
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0984 (SB0604)
Title
Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Construction Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 (SB0397)
Title
Condemnation Proceedings - Compensation and Payment of Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Street Lighting - Purchase of Equipment by Local Government and Tariffs
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1282
Title
Agricultural Land Condemnation Board
Sponsor
Delegate Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0397 (HB1097)
Title
Condemnation Proceedings - Compensation and Payment of Fees
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 (HB0883)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jurisdiction over Eminent Domain Cases - Circuit Court
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 (HB0984)
Title
Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Construction Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0605 Public-Private Partnerships Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
Appropriations
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743) Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013 Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0864 Real Property - Eminent Domain - Limitations on Condemnation Authority Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0883 (SB0398) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jurisdiction over Eminent Domain Cases - Circuit Court Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0984 (SB0604) Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Construction Requirements Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1097 (SB0397) Condemnation Proceedings - Compensation and Payment of Fees Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1177 Street Lighting - Purchase of Equipment by Local Government and Tariffs Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1282 Agricultural Land Condemnation Board Delegate Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0397 (HB1097) Condemnation Proceedings - Compensation and Payment of Fees Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0398 (HB0883) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jurisdiction over Eminent Domain Cases - Circuit Court Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0604 (HB0984) Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Construction Requirements Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM