Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Condemnation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0729 (SB0979)
Title
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346 (SB0850/CH0561)
Title
Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772
Title
Transit Benefit Districts
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 /CH0561 (HB1346)
Title
Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation and Related Study
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0979 (HB0729)
Title
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0729 (SB0979) County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1346 (SB0850/CH0561) Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0772 Transit Benefit Districts Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
SB0850 /CH0561 (HB1346) Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation and Related Study Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0979 (HB0729) County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM