Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Condemnation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0548 (SB1073)
Title
Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0773 (SB0695)
Title
Electricity - Condemnation of Property or Rights for Overhead Transmission Lines - Public Service Commission Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 /CH0773
Title
Electric Facilities – Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines – Additional Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0812 (SB0691)
Title
Electric Facilities - Condemnation - Conserved Land
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1079
Title
Frederick County and Prince George’s County – Building and Housing Codes – Materials Used to Board or Secure Residential Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199
Title
Northern Bay Crossing
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1363
Title
State Roads Commission - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Process on Behalf of the Department of Transportation
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0812)
Title
Electric Facilities – Condemnation – Conserved Land
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 (HB0773)
Title
Electricity - Condemnation of Property or Rights for Overhead Transmission Lines - Public Service Commission Approval
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1003
Title
Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1073 (HB0548)
Title
Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - Application
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0548 (SB1073) Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - Requirements Delegate Healey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0773 (SB0695) Electricity - Condemnation of Property or Rights for Overhead Transmission Lines - Public Service Commission Approval Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0784 /CH0773 Electric Facilities – Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines – Additional Notice Requirements Delegate Impallaria 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 773
Economic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0812 (SB0691) Electric Facilities - Condemnation - Conserved Land Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1079 Frederick County and Prince George’s County – Building and Housing Codes – Materials Used to Board or Secure Residential Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1199 Northern Bay Crossing Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1363 State Roads Commission - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Process on Behalf of the Department of Transportation Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
SB0691 (HB0812) Electric Facilities – Condemnation – Conserved Land Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0695 (HB0773) Electricity - Condemnation of Property or Rights for Overhead Transmission Lines - Public Service Commission Approval Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1003 Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - Limitations Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1073 (HB0548) Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - Application Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM