Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Condemnation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279
Title
Real Property - Restrictions on Use - Low-Impact Landscaping
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0536 /CH0601 (SB0194)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034 (SB0835)
Title
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0194 (HB0536/CH0601)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB1034)
Title
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0279 Real Property - Restrictions on Use - Low-Impact Landscaping Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0536 /CH0601 (SB0194) Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1034 (SB0835) County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0194 (HB0536/CH0601) Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License Senator Reilly 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0835 (HB1034) County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:23 PM