Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Condominiums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0080
Title
Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259 (SB0207)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0412 (SB0229)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on Fees
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422 (SB0991)
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0548 (SB0672)
Title
Condominium Boards of Directors - Membership - Prohibition on Married Couples
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602 /CH0603
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664
Title
Rental Units, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Smoking Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0971
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Unpaid Assessments and Fees - Petition for Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1027
Title
Prince George's County - Condominiums - Limit on Assessments PG 419-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1039
Title
Condominiums - Individual Exceptions to Limitations on Rentals (Maryland Condominium Owners Emergency Relief Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080 (SB0820)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1534
Title
Condominiums - Property and Liability Insurance - Detached Units
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 (HB0259)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229 (HB0412)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit - Limitation on Fees
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274
Title
Business Occupations - Common Ownership Community Managers - Registration
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573
Title
Real Property - Condominiums - Appointment of Receiver
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB0548)
Title
Condominium Boards of Directors - Membership - Prohibition on Married Couples
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820 (HB1080)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991 (HB0422)
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0080 Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0259 (SB0207) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0412 (SB0229) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on Fees Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0422 (SB0991) Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0548 (SB0672) Condominium Boards of Directors - Membership - Prohibition on Married Couples Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0602 /CH0603 Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0664 Rental Units, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Smoking Restrictions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0971 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Unpaid Assessments and Fees - Petition for Relief Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1027 Prince George's County - Condominiums - Limit on Assessments PG 419-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1039 Condominiums - Individual Exceptions to Limitations on Rentals (Maryland Condominium Owners Emergency Relief Act) Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1080 (SB0820) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1534 Condominiums - Property and Liability Insurance - Detached Units Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0207 (HB0259) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0229 (HB0412) Real Property - Condominiums - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit - Limitation on Fees Senator Frosh 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 Business Occupations - Common Ownership Community Managers - Registration Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0573 Real Property - Condominiums - Appointment of Receiver Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0672 (HB0548) Condominium Boards of Directors - Membership - Prohibition on Married Couples Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0820 (HB1080) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0991 (HB0422) Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM