Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Condominiums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373
Title
Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829 (SB0570)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0951
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Exemptions - Landlords
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on Fees
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 (HB0829)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0762
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0041 Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0373 Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential Areas Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0829 (SB0570) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0951 Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Exemptions - Landlords Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1007 Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on Fees Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0570 (HB0829) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0762 Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page