Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Condominiums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077 /CH0346 (SB0258/CH0347)
Title
Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179
Title
Condominiums - Amendment of Declarations
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 /CH0128
Title
Prince George’s County – Utility Services – Master Meters and Task Force PG 429–18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0266
Title
Condominiums - Lien Priority - Unpaid Water and Sewer Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendment of Governing Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0415
Title
Montgomery and Prince George's Counties - Public Utilities - Property Management PG/MC 109-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 (SB0432)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 /CH0345
Title
Condominiums - Suspension of Use of Common Elements
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0997
Title
Condominiums - Transfer of Control - Common Element Reserves
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158 (SB1209)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1491 /CH0532
Title
Public Service Commission – Repeal of Master Metering Authorization and Study on Energy Allocation Systems and Submetering
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Voting, Records, and Conflicts of Interest
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Priority of Liens - Included Charges
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 /CH0347 (HB0077/CH0346)
Title
Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 (HB0564)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0077 /CH0346 (SB0258/CH0347) Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Environment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0179 Condominiums - Amendment of Declarations Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0218 /CH0128 Prince George’s County – Utility Services – Master Meters and Task Force PG 429–18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Economic Matters
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0266 Condominiums - Lien Priority - Unpaid Water and Sewer Charges Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0413 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendment of Governing Documents Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0415 Montgomery and Prince George's Counties - Public Utilities - Property Management PG/MC 109-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0564 (SB0432) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 /CH0345 Condominiums - Suspension of Use of Common Elements Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0602 Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0997 Condominiums - Transfer of Control - Common Element Reserves Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1158 (SB1209) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1491 /CH0532 Public Service Commission – Repeal of Master Metering Authorization and Study on Energy Allocation Systems and Submetering Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0065 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0095 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Voting, Records, and Conflicts of Interest Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0216 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Priority of Liens - Included Charges Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0258 /CH0347 (HB0077/CH0346) Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain Provisions Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0432 (HB0564) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM