Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Congress, U.S.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458 (SB0380)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0467
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873 /CH0282
Title
Election Law - Special Elections - Absentee Ballots for Absent Uniformed Services Voters and Overseas Voters
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002 (SJ0006)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003 (SJ0004)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004 (SJ0003)
Title
United States Congress - Call to Congress and the President to Act on Redistricting Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008 (SJ0002)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380 (HB0458)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0555 (HB0288)
Title
United States Senator, Attorney General, and Comptroller - Temporary Appointments and Special Elections to Fill a Vacancy
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002 (HJ0008)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 (HJ0004)
Title
United States Congress - Call to Congress and the President to Act on Redistricting Reform
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 (HJ0003)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 (HJ0002)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0458 (SB0380) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0467 Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0873 /CH0282 Election Law - Special Elections - Absentee Ballots for Absent Uniformed Services Voters and Overseas Voters Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HJ0002 (SJ0006) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HJ0003 (SJ0004) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HJ0004 (SJ0003) United States Congress - Call to Congress and the President to Act on Redistricting Reform Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HJ0008 (SJ0002) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0380 (HB0458) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0474 Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0555 (HB0288) United States Senator, Attorney General, and Comptroller - Temporary Appointments and Special Elections to Fill a Vacancy Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SJ0002 (HJ0008) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SJ0003 (HJ0004) United States Congress - Call to Congress and the President to Act on Redistricting Reform Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SJ0004 (HJ0003) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SJ0006 (HJ0002) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM