Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Congress, U.S.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962
Title
Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005
Title
Extension of Statutes of Limitations Under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006 (SJ0004)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0007
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008
Title
Establishment of a Presidential Youth Council
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0009 /JR0005
Title
The Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023
Title
Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002 /JR0002 (HJ0002/JR0003)
Title
Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 (HJ0006)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0007
Title
Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0962 Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0966 Legislative and Congressional Districting Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HJ0004 Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HJ0005 Extension of Statutes of Limitations Under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HJ0006 (SJ0004) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HJ0007 United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HJ0008 Establishment of a Presidential Youth Council Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HJ0009 /JR0005 The Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act Delegate Moon 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 5
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1023 Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process Senator Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-45)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 PM
SJ0002 /JR0002 (HJ0002/JR0003) Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal Senator Madaleno 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 PM
SJ0003 United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SJ0004 (HJ0006) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SJ0007 Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM