Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Congress, U.S.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 (SB0307)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0452 /CH0291 (SB0389/CH0292)
Title
Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Congressional Term Limits Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006 (SJ0008)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0011 (SJ0007)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0012
Title
Presidential Authority Over the Use of Nuclear Weapons
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 (HB0356)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389 /CH0292 (HB0452/CH0291)
Title
Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0007 (HJ0011)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0008 (HJ0006)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0356 (SB0307) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0452 /CH0291 (SB0389/CH0292) Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal Delegate Carr 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HJ0004 United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Congressional Term Limits Amendment Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HJ0006 (SJ0008) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HJ0011 (SJ0007) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/05/2018 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HJ0012 Presidential Authority Over the Use of Nuclear Weapons Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/05/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0307 (HB0356) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0389 /CH0292 (HB0452/CH0291) Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SJ0007 (HJ0011) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SJ0008 (HJ0006) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM