Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 /CH0380 (SB0073)
Title
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069
Title
Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting Fixtures
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361
Title
State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0473 (SB0787)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0789 (SB0709)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861 (SB0259/CH0287)
Title
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1028
Title
Prince George's County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Report on County Funding Plan PG 417-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165 /CH0349 (SB0875/CH0348)
Title
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1437
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release - Demonstrated Financial Hardship
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463 (SB1020)
Title
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 /CH0012
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Value of Easement
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 (HB0058/CH0380)
Title
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135
Title
Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Enforcement by Department of the Environment - Moratorium
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259 /CH0287 (HB0861)
Title
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359
Title
Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - Impervious Surface - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB0789)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB0473)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 /CH0348 (HB1165/CH0349)
Title
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1020 (HB1463)
Title
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 /CH0380 (SB0073) Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0069 Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting Fixtures Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0361 State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0473 (SB0787) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Delegate Summers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0789 (SB0709) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB0861 (SB0259/CH0287) Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1028 Prince George's County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Report on County Funding Plan PG 417-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1165 /CH0349 (SB0875/CH0348) Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1437 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release - Demonstrated Financial Hardship Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1463 (SB1020) Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0071 /CH0012 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Value of Easement Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0073 (HB0058/CH0380) Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations Senator Colburn 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0135 Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Enforcement by Department of the Environment - Moratorium Senator Glassman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0259 /CH0287 (HB0861) Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Environmental Matters
SB0359 Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - Impervious Surface - Definition Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0709 (HB0789) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Senator Dyson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0787 (HB0473) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0875 /CH0348 (HB1165/CH0349) Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Finance
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1020 (HB1463) Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM