Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0002 (SB0615)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0156 (SB0133/CH0153)
Title
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169 (SB0211)
Title
State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238
Title
Forest Conservation Act - Exemption - Hazards to Air Navigation
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336
Title
Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting Fixtures
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635 (SB0032)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Northwest Trek Conservation and Education Center
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 (HB0635)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Northwest Trek Conservation and Education Center
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0133 /CH0153 (HB0156)
Title
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road Property
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 (HB0169)
Title
State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0370
Title
Chesapeake Bay Trust and Chesapeake Conservation Corps - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 (HB0002)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826
Title
Energy Efficiency Programs - Transferring Development to the Maryland Energy Administration
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0002 (SB0615) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0156 (SB0133/CH0153) Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0169 (SB0211) State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0238 Forest Conservation Act - Exemption - Hazards to Air Navigation Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting Fixtures Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0635 (SB0032) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Northwest Trek Conservation and Education Center Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 AM
SB0032 (HB0635) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Northwest Trek Conservation and Education Center Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 12:00 PM
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0133 /CH0153 (HB0156) Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0171 Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road Property Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0211 (HB0169) State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0600 /CH0370 Chesapeake Bay Trust and Chesapeake Conservation Corps - Funding Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0615 (HB0002) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0826 Energy Efficiency Programs - Transferring Development to the Maryland Energy Administration Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM