Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 /CH0614
Title
State Government - Pollinator Habitat Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276 /CH0352 (SB0137/CH0351)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197
Title
Prince George's County - Forest Conservation Act - Net Tract Area PG/MC 114-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1643 (SB0371)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0043
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0351 (HB0276/CH0352)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 (HB1643)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Northwest Trek Conservation and Education Center
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0132 /CH0614 State Government - Pollinator Habitat Plans Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0276 /CH0352 (SB0137/CH0351) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1197 Prince George's County - Forest Conservation Act - Net Tract Area PG/MC 114-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1643 (SB0371) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0061 /CH0043 Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and Clarifications Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 /CH0351 (HB0276/CH0352) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0371 (HB1643) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0642 Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Northwest Trek Conservation and Education Center Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM