Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Constitutional Amendments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044 (SB0091)
Title
Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 (SB0313)
Title
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182
Title
Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463 (SB0110)
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts)
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487
Title
Judicial Elections - Retention and Frequency
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535 (SB0373)
Title
Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642
Title
Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Use of Pesticides by Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651
Title
Montgomery County - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Rate of Assessment and Term of Agreements MC 27-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0724
Title
Legislative Districts - Single-Member Delegate Districts (One Person One Vote Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1031
Title
Declaration of Rights - Right of Bodily Integrity and Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1048
Title
Legislative Districts - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1108
Title
State Budget
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1329 (SB0595)
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0001 (SJ0003)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Congressional Term Limits Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 (HB0044)
Title
Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0110 (HB0463)
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0246
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0313 (HB0085)
Title
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0373 (HB0535)
Title
Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0595 (HB1329)
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0968
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Selection and Tenure
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0990
Title
State Budget
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 (HJ0001)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Congressional Term Limits Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0044 (SB0091) Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0085 (SB0313) General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0182 Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0463 (SB0110) Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts) Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0472 Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0487 Judicial Elections - Retention and Frequency Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0535 (SB0373) Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0632 Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0642 Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Use of Pesticides by Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0651 Montgomery County - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Rate of Assessment and Term of Agreements MC 27-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0724 Legislative Districts - Single-Member Delegate Districts (One Person One Vote Act of 2019) Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB1031 Declaration of Rights - Right of Bodily Integrity and Privacy Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1048 Legislative Districts - Standards Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB1108 State Budget Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1329 (SB0595) Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HJ0001 (SJ0003) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Congressional Term Limits Amendment Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0091 (HB0044) Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0110 (HB0463) Congressional Districts - Standards Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0246 Circuit Court Judges - Election Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0313 (HB0085) General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0373 (HB0535) Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0595 (HB1329) Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0776 Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0968 Circuit Court Judges - Selection and Tenure Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0990 State Budget Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SJ0003 (HJ0001) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Congressional Term Limits Amendment Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:20 PM