Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Constitutional Amendments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0035
Title
Judges – Selection and Retention
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 (SB0151)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0265 (SB0006)
Title
General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339
Title
Legislative Districts - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts)
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447
Title
Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0481
Title
Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0725
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Legislative Sessions
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885 (SB0666)
Title
Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals – Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902 (SB0669)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0965
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985
Title
Election Law – State Officials – Recall Election
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1031
Title
General Assembly - Term Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158
Title
Calvert County - Training on The 1776 Report - Referendum
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1237 (SB0908)
Title
Budget Bill – Appropriations Statement – Memorandum of Understanding for State Personnel
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1260
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts)
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005
Title
United States of America – District of Columbia – Statehood
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 (HB0265)
Title
General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0055
Title
Legislative Department - Eligibility to Serve as Senators and Delegates - Place of Abode
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0151 (HB0082)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 (HB0885)
Title
Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 (HB0902)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773
Title
Constitutional Amendment - General Assembly - Standing Committee Appointments
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908 (HB1237)
Title
Budget Bill – Appropriations Statement – Memorandum of Understanding for State Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0007
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0035 Judges – Selection and Retention Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
HB0082 (SB0151) Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0265 (SB0006) General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0339 Legislative Districts - Standards Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0410 Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts) Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0447 Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
HB0481 Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0725 Constitutional Amendment - Legislative Sessions Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/15/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0885 (SB0666) Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals – Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0902 (SB0669) Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0965 Congressional Districts - Standards Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/15/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0985 Election Law – State Officials – Recall Election Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1031 General Assembly - Term Limits Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/15/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB1158 Calvert County - Training on The 1776 Report - Referendum Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1237 (SB0908) Budget Bill – Appropriations Statement – Memorandum of Understanding for State Personnel Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1260 Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts) Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/15/2021 - 9:30 AM
HJ0005 United States of America – District of Columbia – Statehood Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/15/2021 - 9:30 AM
HJ0006 United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/15/2021 - 9:30 AM
SB0006 (HB0265) General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0055 Legislative Department - Eligibility to Serve as Senators and Delegates - Place of Abode Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0151 (HB0082) Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0295 Circuit Court Judges - Election Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0666 (HB0885) Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0669 (HB0902) Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0773 Constitutional Amendment - General Assembly - Standing Committee Appointments Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 11:30 a.m.
Rules
3/05/2021 - 11:30 AM
SB0908 (HB1237) Budget Bill – Appropriations Statement – Memorandum of Understanding for State Personnel Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SJ0007 United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2021 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 4:12 PM
Click to return on the top page