Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Constitution, U.S.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002 /JR0003 (SJ0002/JR0002)
Title
Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006 (SJ0004)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0007
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636 /CH0478
Title
Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002 /JR0002 (HJ0002/JR0003)
Title
Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 (HJ0006)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0966 Legislative and Congressional Districting Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HJ0002 /JR0003 (SJ0002/JR0002) Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal Delegate Frick 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HJ0006 (SJ0004) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HJ0007 United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0636 /CH0478 Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States Constitution Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SJ0002 /JR0002 (HJ0002/JR0003) Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal Senator Madaleno 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 PM
SJ0003 United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SJ0004 (HJ0006) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM