Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Constitution, U.S.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Congressional Term Limits Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006 (SJ0008)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0011 (SJ0007)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Discriminatory Harassment
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0007 (HJ0011)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0008 (HJ0006)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HJ0004 United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Congressional Term Limits Amendment Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HJ0006 (SJ0008) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HJ0011 (SJ0007) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/05/2018 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0525 Public Institutions of Higher Education – Discriminatory Harassment Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SJ0007 (HJ0011) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SJ0008 (HJ0006) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal Power Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM