Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Consumer Price Index

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147
Title
Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index Adjustments
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0483 (SB0589)
Title
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - Repeal
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573 (SB0518)
Title
Fair Elections Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 (SB0357)
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0774
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 (SB0752)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 (SB0134)
Title
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to Counties
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 (HB1091)
Title
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to Counties
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0357 (HB0631)
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 (HB0573)
Title
Fair Elections Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0589 (HB0483)
Title
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - Repeal
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB0993)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0147 Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index Adjustments Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0174 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0483 (SB0589) Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - Repeal Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0573 (SB0518) Fair Elections Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0631 (SB0357) Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0774 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Ways and Means
HB0993 (SB0752) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1091 (SB0134) Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to Counties Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0010 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0134 (HB1091) Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to Counties Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0357 (HB0631) Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment Senator McFadden 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0518 (HB0573) Fair Elections Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0589 (HB0483) Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - Repeal President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0752 (HB0993) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM