Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Consumer Price Index

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0038
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159
Title
Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index Adjustments
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505 /CH0670 (SB0390/CH0669)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 (SB0497)
Title
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0724 /CH0724 (SB0462)
Title
Public Health - Copies of Medical Records - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 /CH0678 (SB0485/CH0677)
Title
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821
Title
Energy Storage Portfolio Standard (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1026
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Fares - Calculation and Public Comment
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192 /CH0735 (SB0816)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 (SB0940)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Repeal of Tip Credit (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409 (SB0263)
Title
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forest and State Park Land
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146 /CH0052
Title
Harford County - State's Attorney - Salary
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 (HB1409)
Title
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forests, State Parks, and Wildlife Management Areas
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 /CH0669 (HB0505/CH0670)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0462 (HB0724/CH0724)
Title
Public Health - Copies of Medical Records - Fees
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0485 /CH0677 (HB0740/CH0678)
Title
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 (HB0595)
Title
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816 (HB1192/CH0735)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940 (HB1372)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Repeal of Tip Credit
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0981
Title
Public Health - Copies of Medical Records - Fees
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1043
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living Adjustment
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0038 State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - Alterations Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 12:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/02/2016 - 12:30 PM
HB0116 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0159 Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index Adjustments Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0505 /CH0670 (SB0390/CH0669) Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0595 (SB0497) Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0724 /CH0724 (SB0462) Public Health - Copies of Medical Records - Fees Delegate Oaks 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 724
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0740 /CH0678 (SB0485/CH0677) Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave Insurance Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678
Economic Matters
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0821 Energy Storage Portfolio Standard (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1026 Maryland Transit Administration - Fares - Calculation and Public Comment Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1192 /CH0735 (SB0816) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees Delegate McMillan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1372 (SB0940) Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Repeal of Tip Credit (Fight for Fifteen) Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 (SB0263) Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forest and State Park Land Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0146 /CH0052 Harford County - State's Attorney - Salary Harford County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0263 (HB1409) Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forests, State Parks, and Wildlife Management Areas Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0390 /CH0669 (HB0505/CH0670) Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0462 (HB0724/CH0724) Public Health - Copies of Medical Records - Fees Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0485 /CH0677 (HB0740/CH0678) Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave Insurance Senator Pugh 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Finance
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0497 (HB0595) Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1)
Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0816 (HB1192/CH0735) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0940 (HB1372) Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Repeal of Tip Credit Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0981 Public Health - Copies of Medical Records - Fees Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1043 Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Cost-of-Living Adjustment Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM