Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Consumer Price Index

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0424 (SB0447)
Title
Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 (SB0670)
Title
Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 (SB0957)
Title
Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0539)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447 (HB0424)
Title
Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0839)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637
Title
Children – Therapeutic Child Care Program – Funding
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB0564)
Title
Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 (HB0784)
Title
Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0424 (SB0447) Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0564 (SB0670) Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0784 (SB0957) Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study Delegate Carey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0839 (SB0539) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1126 Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0003 Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0447 (HB0424) Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0539 (HB0839) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0637 Children – Therapeutic Child Care Program – Funding Senator King 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0670 (HB0564) Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0957 (HB0784) Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 2:04 PM