Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Contests

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0417
Title
State Song - Replacement - State Song Selection Panel and Competition
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 /CH0122
Title
Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1495 (SB0942/CH0704)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial Review
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0048
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - Required
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0222
Title
Maryland State Song - Repeal and Replace - State Song Selection Panel
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0942 /CH0704 (HB1495)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial Review
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0976
Title
Commercial Daily Fantasy Sports - Authorization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0417 State Song - Replacement - State Song Selection Panel and Competition Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0801 /CH0122 Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1495 (SB0942/CH0704) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial Review Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0109 /CH0048 Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - Required Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0222 Maryland State Song - Repeal and Replace - State Song Selection Panel Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0942 /CH0704 (HB1495) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial Review Senator Ramirez 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0976 Commercial Daily Fantasy Sports - Authorization and Regulation Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM