Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Continuing Care -see also- Long-Term Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240 /CH0149
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 10-13
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292 /CH0411
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses and Appeals
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404 (SB0992)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 18-13
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0178
Title
Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0992 (HB1404)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 18-13
Sponsor
Howard County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1240 /CH0149 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 10-13 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1292 /CH0411 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses and Appeals Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1404 (SB0992) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 18-13 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
SB0083 /CH0178 Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Finance
1/17/2013 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0992 (HB1404) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 18-13 Howard County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM