Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Continuing Care -see also- Long-Term Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0416 (SB0873)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0588
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 /CH0678 (SB0485/CH0677)
Title
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090 /CH0130 (SB0670)
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 15-16
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267
Title
Poly-Morphone-Assisted Treatment Pilot Program - Harm Reduction Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1296
Title
Public Safety - Police Training Commission - Community Service Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - Disenrollment
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385 /CH0510
Title
Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance Directives
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0485 /CH0677 (HB0740/CH0678)
Title
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB1090/CH0130)
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873 (HB0416)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0416 (SB0873) Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0588 Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0740 /CH0678 (SB0485/CH0677) Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave Insurance Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678
Economic Matters
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1090 /CH0130 (SB0670) Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 15-16 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1267 Poly-Morphone-Assisted Treatment Pilot Program - Harm Reduction Act of 2016 Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1296 Public Safety - Police Training Commission - Community Service Requirement Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1347 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - Disenrollment Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 /CH0510 Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance Directives Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0485 /CH0677 (HB0740/CH0678) Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave Insurance Senator Pugh 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Finance
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0670 (HB1090/CH0130) Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0873 (HB0416) Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM