Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Continuing Care -see also- Long-Term Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316 /CH0502
Title
Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0588 /CH0243 (SB0698/CH0244)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0592 /CH0545 (SB0669)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 /CH0696
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Facility for the Aged License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171
Title
Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1225 (SB0266)
Title
Parking for Individuals With Disabilities - Continuing Care Retirement Facility - Time Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 (HB1225)
Title
Parking for Individuals With Disabilities – Continuing Care Retirement Facility – Time Limitation
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0411
Title
Election Law - Polling Places at Continuing Care Retirement Communities
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0635
Title
Mental Health - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 (HB0592/CH0545)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 /CH0244 (HB0588/CH0243)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0316 /CH0502 Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0588 /CH0243 (SB0698/CH0244) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0592 /CH0545 (SB0669) Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0805 /CH0696 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Facility for the Aged License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1171 Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1225 (SB0266) Parking for Individuals With Disabilities - Continuing Care Retirement Facility - Time Limitation Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0266 (HB1225) Parking for Individuals With Disabilities – Continuing Care Retirement Facility – Time Limitation Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0411 Election Law - Polling Places at Continuing Care Retirement Communities Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0635 Mental Health - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0669 (HB0592/CH0545) Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0698 /CH0244 (HB0588/CH0243) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:20 PM