Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Continuing Education -see also- Job Training

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823
Title
Workgroup on Effective Professional Development Programs in Local Health Departments
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0905
Title
Electricians - Low-Voltage Electricians, Continuing Education, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0927
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission – Training Requirements – Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0998 (SB0655)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers - Examination and Continuing Professional Competency Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1228 /CH0381 (SB0807)
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Brokerage Relationships, Continuing Education, and Disclosures
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250 (SB0588)
Title
Career Education Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270
Title
Maryland Elder Abuse Victims Resources Committee
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1288 /CH0535 (SB0916)
Title
Physicians – Dispensing Permit Exemption – Topical Medication
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029 /CH0102
Title
Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0588 (HB1250)
Title
Career Education Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 (HB0998)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers - Examination and Continuing Professional Competency Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0807 (HB1228/CH0381)
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Brokerage Relationships, Continuing Education, and Disclosures
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0916 (HB1288/CH0535)
Title
Physicians – Dispensing Permit Exemption – Topical Medication
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1016
Title
Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1041
Title
Public Health - Care of Medically Fragile Individuals (Channing's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0823 Workgroup on Effective Professional Development Programs in Local Health Departments Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0905 Electricians - Low-Voltage Electricians, Continuing Education, and Penalties Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0927 Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission – Training Requirements – Firearms Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
HB0998 (SB0655) Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers - Examination and Continuing Professional Competency Requirements Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1228 /CH0381 (SB0807) State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Brokerage Relationships, Continuing Education, and Disclosures Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Economic Matters
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1250 (SB0588) Career Education Act of 2019 Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1270 Maryland Elder Abuse Victims Resources Committee Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1288 /CH0535 (SB0916) Physicians – Dispensing Permit Exemption – Topical Medication Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0029 /CH0102 Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Finance
1/10/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0588 (HB1250) Career Education Act of 2019 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0655 (HB0998) Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers - Examination and Continuing Professional Competency Requirements Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0807 (HB1228/CH0381) State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Brokerage Relationships, Continuing Education, and Disclosures Senator Patterson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0916 (HB1288/CH0535) Physicians – Dispensing Permit Exemption – Topical Medication Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1016 Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1041 Public Health - Care of Medically Fragile Individuals (Channing's Law) Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:20 PM