Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Conventions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0461 (SB0349/CH0460)
Title
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525 (SB0516/CH0283)
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743)
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0129 /CH0182
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class H-CC (Corporate Club/Conference Center) License
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0349 /CH0460 (HB0275/CH0461)
Title
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 /CH0283 (HB0525)
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002
Title
U.S. Constitution - Article V Amendments Convention - State Approval of Federal Debt Increases
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0275 /CH0461 (SB0349/CH0460) Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013 Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0525 (SB0516/CH0283) Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743) Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013 Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0129 /CH0182 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class H-CC (Corporate Club/Conference Center) License Senator Glassman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0349 /CH0460 (HB0275/CH0461) Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013 Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0516 /CH0283 (HB0525) Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SJ0002 U.S. Constitution - Article V Amendments Convention - State Approval of Federal Debt Increases Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page