Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Conventions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137 /CH0097
Title
Charles County - Taxing Districts for Infrastructure Improvements - Repeal of Restriction
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006 (SJ0005)
Title
Constitutional Convention - Amendment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008 (SJ0002)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002 (HJ0008)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005 (HJ0006)
Title
Constitutional Convention - Amendment - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0137 /CH0097 Charles County - Taxing Districts for Infrastructure Improvements - Repeal of Restriction Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HJ0006 (SJ0005) Constitutional Convention - Amendment - Repeal Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HJ0008 (SJ0002) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SJ0002 (HJ0008) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SJ0005 (HJ0006) Constitutional Convention - Amendment - Repeal Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM