Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cooperative Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 /CH0730
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Notice Requirements, and Loitering Enforcement PG 303-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1021 /CH0730 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Notice Requirements, and Loitering Enforcement PG 303-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1061 Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Registration Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM