Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cooperative Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Statewide Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386 /CH0444
Title
Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0041 Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Statewide Registration Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/24/2017 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0386 /CH0444 Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1192 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1193 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
SB0530 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM